AZ SB1373 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-05 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-05 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Technical correction; statute of limitations
Title
Technical correction; statute of limitations
Sponsors
Sen. Don Shooter [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 10 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 10 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2012-04-03 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-29 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-29 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2012-03-19 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-21 | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-0-0-0-0) | |
2012-03-20 | Referred to House APPROP Committee | |
2012-03-20 | House read second time | |
2012-03-19 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-03-13 | Transmit to House | |
2012-03-08 | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (10-18-2-0) | |
2012-03-06 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-28 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-23 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-23 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-26 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-14 | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-4-1-0) | |
2012-01-30 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2012-01-30 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-26 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-14 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2012-01-26 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |