AZ SB1372 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Chapter 166
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Chapter 166
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Family reunification treatment; prohibitions
Title
Family reunification treatment; prohibitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 166 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-04-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (32-27-1-0) |
2024-04-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-03-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-25 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-03-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-20 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-1-0-0-0) |
2024-03-13 | House | House read second time |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-03-05 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-9-2-0) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate TTMC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TTMC Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Definition
Family Reunification Treatment
Legal Custody
Legal Decision-making
Marital And Domestic Relations - Title 25
Prohibited Conditions
Prohibition (h)
Prohibitions
Reuniting
Family Reunification Treatment
Legal Custody
Legal Decision-making
Marital And Domestic Relations - Title 25
Prohibited Conditions
Prohibition (h)
Prohibitions
Reuniting