AZ SB1369 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-10 - Referred to House TI Committee
Pending: House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-10 - Referred to House TI Committee
Pending: House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Speed limits; local authorities; signage
Title
Speed limits; local authorities; signage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | House | Referred to House TI Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | House read second time |
2015-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-09 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2015-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-11-2-0) |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-1-0) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate TRANS Committee |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TRANS Committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |