AZ SB1367 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Chapter 133
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Abortion; live delivery; report; definition

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion; live delivery; report; definition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31SenateChapter 133
2017-03-31SenateGovernor Signed
2017-03-29SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-03-29SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (18-11-1-0)
2017-03-29SenateSenate concurs
2017-03-29SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2017-03-29SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2017-03-29SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-03-29HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (34-22-4-0)
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-03-21HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-21HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-2-0-2-0-0)
2017-03-15HouseHouse JPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
2017-03-01HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-28HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-28HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2017-02-28HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-02-23HouseTransmit to House
2017-02-22SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (18-12-0-0)
2017-02-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-21SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-21SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-02-15SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-0)
2017-02-01SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2017-01-31SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
362161Amended CodeSee Bill Text
362163Amended CodeSee Bill Text
362301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
362301.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36449.03Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69196
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1367p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1367s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1367h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0133.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.1367barto.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.1367hhs.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.1367smith0856.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.1367farnsworth e.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/h.1367judiciary and public safety.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69196&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69196&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69196&billStatusActionId=175554&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69196&billStatusActionId=175406&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69196&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69196&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69196&billStatusActionId=176752&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69196&billStatusActionId=176753&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69196&billStatusActionId=176774&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69196&billStatusActionId=176776&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback