AZ SB1366 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Chapter 272
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Chapter 272
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Remediated groundwater use; date; extension
Title
Remediated groundwater use; date; extension
Sponsors
Sen. Sine Kerr [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 272 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (28-2-0-0) |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-04-08 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2021-04-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-31 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2021-03-29 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-23 | House | House NREW Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-17 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
2050 (h)
Active Management Areas
Alternative Water Supply
Aquifer
Assured Water Supply (h)
Beneficial Use
Cercla
Cost
Date (h)
Definition
Exemption
Extension (h)
Grandfathered Groundwater Rights
Groundwater
Management Plans
Municipal Water Provider
Remedial Action
Remediated Groundwater Use (h)
Remediated Water
Repeal
Replenishment
Rules
Surface Water
Use
Water
Waters - Title 45
Active Management Areas
Alternative Water Supply
Aquifer
Assured Water Supply (h)
Beneficial Use
Cercla
Cost
Date (h)
Definition
Exemption
Extension (h)
Grandfathered Groundwater Rights
Groundwater
Management Plans
Municipal Water Provider
Remedial Action
Remediated Groundwater Use (h)
Remediated Water
Repeal
Replenishment
Rules
Surface Water
Use
Water
Waters - Title 45
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 454.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 563.03 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 576 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |