AZ SB1361 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Chapter 224
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

G&F; heritage fund; expenditures

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

G&F; heritage fund; expenditures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-12 Chapter 224
2016-05-12 Governor Signed
2016-05-09 Transmitted to Governor
2016-05-06HouseTransmit to Senate
2016-05-06HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (36-17-7-0)
2016-03-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2016-03-24HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-24HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-24HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0)
2016-03-03HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2016-03-17HouseHouse AWL Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-2-0)
2016-03-07HouseReferred to House AWL Committee
2016-03-07HouseHouse read second time
2016-03-03HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2016-03-03HouseAssigned to House AWL Committee
2016-03-03HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2016-03-01SenateTransmit to House
2016-03-01SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (21-8-1-0)
2016-02-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2016-02-23SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2016-01-28SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-16SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-1-0)
2016-01-28SenateReferred to Senate APPROP Committee
2016-02-08SenateSenate NR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-2-0)
2016-02-01SenateReferred to Senate NR Committee
2016-02-01SenateSenate read second time
2016-01-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2016-01-28SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2016-01-28SenateAssigned to Senate NR Committee
2016-01-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback