AZ SB1355 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
AHCCCS; dental services; native Americans
Title
AHCCCS; dental services; native Americans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-08 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-1-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-28 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-06 | House | House read second time |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-28 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-5-0-0) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Ahcccs
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System
Dental Services
Federal Authorization
Indian And Tribal Health
Native Americans
Reimbursement
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System
Dental Services
Federal Authorization
Indian And Tribal Health
Native Americans
Reimbursement