AZ SB1352 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by HB2008
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
ASRS; employer; member; contribution.
Title
ASRS; employer; member; contribution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-1-0) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2008 (Replaced by) 2021-02-26 - Chapter 36
Subjects
Asrs
Contributions
Credit
Employers
Members
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
State Retirement System
Contributions
Credit
Employers
Members
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
State Retirement System