AZ SB1338 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (8-20-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (8-20-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Use tax; retailer; definition
Title
Use tax; retailer; definition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 8 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 8 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (8-20-2-0) | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained | |
2012-03-01 | Senate Consent Calendar March 01, 2012 @ 1:25 PM with Objections | |
2012-03-01 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-01 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-01 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-26 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-08 | Senate CE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-26 | Referred to Senate CE Committee | |
2012-01-30 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2012-01-30 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-26 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-26 | Assigned to Senate CE Committee | |
2012-01-26 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2012-01-26 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |