AZ SB1335 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-23 - Senate majority caucus: Hold
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-23 - Senate majority caucus: Hold
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Student count; fortieth day; removal
Title
Student count; fortieth day; removal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | Senate majority caucus: Hold | |
2010-03-23 | Senate minority caucus: Hold | |
2010-03-22 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-24 | Senate FIN Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-3-1-0) | |
2010-02-22 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2010-02-22 | Senate ED Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Senate ED Committee | |
2010-02-03 | Senate read second time | |
2010-02-03 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-22 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2010-02-03 | Assigned to Senate ED Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Arizona State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=93&Bill_Number=SB1335 |
Text | http://www.azleg.gov/legtext/49leg/2r/bills/sb1335p.htm |