AZ SB1332 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Chapter 287
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Workers' compensation; settlement; travel expenses

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' compensation; settlement; travel expenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-08SenateChapter 287
2017-05-08SenateGovernor Signed
2017-05-04SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-05-04SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-05-04HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (50-7-3-0)
2017-04-27HouseTransmit to House
2017-04-27SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (27-0-3-0)
2017-04-27SenateSenate Conference adopted
2017-04-26HouseHouse Conference adopted
2017-04-26HouseHouse Conference caucus date
2017-04-25SenateSenate Conference caucus date
2017-04-20SenateSenate Conference report: That the Senate accept the House amendments and the bill be further amended.
2017-04-18HouseHouse Conference members: LIVINGSTON, FARNSWORTH E, SALMAN
2017-04-18HouseHouse Conference appointed
2017-04-18SenateSenate Conference members: FANN, BOWIE, PETERSEN
2017-04-18SenateSenate Conference appointed
2017-04-18SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2017-04-18SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2017-04-17SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-04-17HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (39-19-1-0)
2017-04-12HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-04-11HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-04-11HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-04-10HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2017-03-13HouseHouse BI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2017-03-01HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-28HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-28HouseAssigned to House BI Committee
2017-02-28HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-02-23HouseTransmit to House
2017-02-23SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2017-02-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-21SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-21SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-02-13SenateSenate COMPS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2017-01-30SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-26SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-26SenateAssigned to Senate COMPS Committee
2017-01-26SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
231044Amended CodeSee Bill Text
231062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
23722.04Amended CodeSee Bill Text
23941.01Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69153
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1332p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1332s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1332h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1332c.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0287.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.1332smith.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.1332comps.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.1332livingston.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/h.1332banking and insurance.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/ccamendments/53leg/1r/s.13320358.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69153&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69153&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69153&billStatusActionId=175582&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69153&billStatusActionId=175431&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69153&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69153&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69153&billStatusActionId=176930&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69153&billStatusActionId=177022&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69153&billStatusActionId=177296&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69153&billStatusActionId=177362&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback