AZ SB1328 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Chapter 109
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Barbers; cosmetologists; licensure; reciprocity; apprenticeships

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Barbers; cosmetologists; licensure; reciprocity; apprenticeships

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateChapter 109
2019-04-17SenateGovernor Signed
2019-04-11SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-04-10SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-04-10HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2019-04-10HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-04-09HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-09HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-08HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-04-08HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-1-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-25HouseHouse RA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-06HouseHouse read second time
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to House RA Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-03-04HouseTransmit to House
2019-03-04SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2019-02-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-26SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-26SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-25SenateSenate consent calendar
2019-02-25SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-21SenateSenate COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-0)
2019-02-04SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate COM Committee
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32322Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32352Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32504Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32506Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32511Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71953
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1328p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1328s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0109.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1328pace1248.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71953&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71953&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71953&billStatusActionId=187390&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71953&billStatusActionId=187626&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71953&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71953&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71953&billStatusActionId=188897&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71953&billStatusActionId=188900&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback