AZ SB1322 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Chapter 243
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Chapter 243
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Eviction proceedings; virtual appearances
Title
Eviction proceedings; virtual appearances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 243 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-04-08 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-24-1-0) |
2021-04-07 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2021-04-07 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (39-19-2-0) |
2021-04-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-03-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-31 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-29 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-03-29 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-24 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-10 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-03-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate motion to reconsider third reading |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-15-1-0) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-1-0) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Detainer Actions
Eviction Proceedings
Forcible Detainer
Special Detainer Actions
Telephones
Video Conference
Virtual Appearances
Eviction Proceedings
Forcible Detainer
Special Detainer Actions
Telephones
Video Conference
Virtual Appearances