AZ SB1318 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-25 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-25 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Animal shelters; procedures; requirements
Title
Animal shelters; procedures; requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-25 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-25 | Senate GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-1-1-0) | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-02-03 | Senate NRIPD Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Senate NRIPD Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Senate read second time | |
2010-02-01 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-03 | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Assigned to Senate NRIPD Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Arizona State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=93&Bill_Number=SB1318 |
Text | http://www.azleg.gov/legtext/49leg/2r/bills/sb1318p.htm |