AZ SB1315 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - House read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - House read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Legal decision-making; parenting time
Title
Legal decision-making; parenting time
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-28 | House | Assigned to House JPS Committee |
2017-02-28 | House | Assigned to House JPS Committee |
2017-02-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-2-0-0) |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 403.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |