AZ SB1313 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - House JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - House JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Juror contact; advisement; interview requirements
Title
Juror contact; advisement; interview requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | House JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-05 | House | House read second time |
2019-03-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-04 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2019-03-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |