AZ SB1312 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Chapter 162
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Chapter 162
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fire districts; operations; revisions
Title
Fire districts; operations; revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Chapter 162 | |
2015-04-01 | Governor Signed | |
2015-03-26 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-03-24 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-03-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2015-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2015-03-17 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-17 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-09 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | House read second time |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2015-02-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate GOV Committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |