AZ SB1312 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-08 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-08 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
STOs; credits; administration.
Title
STOs; credits; administration.
Sponsors
Sen. Sylvia Allen [R] | Sen. Frank Antenori [R] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Sen. Andy Biggs [R] | Sen. Scott Bundgaard [R] | Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Rep. Steve Court [R] |
Rep. Tom Forese [R] | Rep. Doris Goodale [R] | Sen. Ron Gould [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Sen. Rick Gray [R] | Rep. Gail Griffin [R] | Rep. Peggy Judd [R] | Sen. Lori Klein [R] |
Sen. Debbie Lesko [R] | Sen. Albert Melvin [R] | Rep. Steve Montenegro [R] | Sen. Rick Murphy [R] |
Rep. Stephen Pierce [R] | Rep. Franklin Pratt [R] | Rep. Terri Proud [R] | Rep. Carl Seel [R] |
Sen. Don Shooter [R] | Rep. David Smith [R] | Sen. Steve Smith [R] | Rep. David Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 8 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 9 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 8 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 9 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-08 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-23 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-14 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-10 | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-2-1-0) | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-31 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |