AZ SB1304 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - House read second time
Pending: House Land & Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - House read second time
Pending: House Land & Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Pest management; unlicensed business activities
Title
Pest management; unlicensed business activities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House LAG Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-20 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (20-7-3-0) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate WAG Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate WAG Committee |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 3603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 3624 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |