AZ SB1304 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-22 - House Consent Calendar March 22, 2012 @ 2:51 PM
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-22 - House Consent Calendar March 22, 2012 @ 2:51 PM
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Firearms regulation; political subdivisions
Title
Firearms regulation; political subdivisions
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Antenori [R] | Sen. Chester Crandell [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Debbie Lesko [R] |
Sen. Javan Mesnard [R] | Rep. Carl Seel [R] | Rep. David Smith [R] | Rep. David Stevens [R] |
Rep. James Weiers [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | House Consent Calendar March 22, 2012 @ 2:51 PM | |
2012-03-22 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-22 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-22 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-03-12 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-15 | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-2-0) | |
2012-03-13 | Referred to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-03-13 | House read second time | |
2012-03-12 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-12 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-03-06 | Transmit to House | |
2012-03-06 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-11-1-0) | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-01 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-01 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-01 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-26 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-13 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-1-0) | |
2012-01-30 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2012-01-30 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-26 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-26 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2012-01-26 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |