AZ SB1303 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Chapter 77
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Annexation of territory; requirements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Annexation of territory; requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-05SenateChapter 77
2020-06-05SenateGovernor Signed
2020-05-26SenateTransmitted to Governor
2020-05-21SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-05-21HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (41-19-0-0)
2020-05-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2020-05-21HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-05-21HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-05-21HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2020-05-21HouseHouse GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-03-10HouseHouse read second time
2020-03-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-03-09HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2020-03-09HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-03-02HouseTransmit to House
2020-03-02SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2020-02-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-25SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-25SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-24SenateSenate consent calendar
2020-02-24SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-02-17SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2020-01-29SenateSenate read second time
2020-01-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-01-28SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2020-01-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9471Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/73560
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1303p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1303s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/laws/0077.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1303pratt0135.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73560&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73560&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73560&billStatusActionId=194547&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73560&billStatusActionId=194962&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73560&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73560&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73560&billStatusActionId=196331&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73560&billStatusActionId=196342&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback