AZ SB1301 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - House read second time
Pending: House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - House read second time
Pending: House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Water banking; storage credits; subcontractors
Title
Water banking; storage credits; subcontractors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate WAG Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate WAG Committee |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |