AZ SB1300 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - House read second time
Pending: House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - House read second time
Pending: House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Electromagnetic pulse preparedness; posting
Title
Electromagnetic pulse preparedness; posting
Sponsors
Sen. David Farnsworth [R] | Sen. Shawnna Bolick [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Sen. Wendy Rogers [R] | Sen. Janae Shamp [R] | Sen. Justine Wadsack [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-20 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate MAPS Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Definition
Electromagnetic Pulse Preparedness
Emergency Management
Military Affairs And Emergency Management - Title 26
Posting
Recommendations
Update
Electromagnetic Pulse Preparedness
Emergency Management
Military Affairs And Emergency Management - Title 26
Posting
Recommendations
Update