AZ SB1293 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Chapter 206
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Chapter 206
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Private vocational program license; exemption
Title
Private vocational program license; exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC W/FL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC W/FL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | Senate | Chapter 206 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-04-20 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (43-12-3-1) |
2017-04-13 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2017-03-07 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-07 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-06 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-03-06 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-02-28 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-23 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-20 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COMPS Committee |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Education
Exemption
Licenses
Private Postsecondary Education
Private Vocational Program
Professions And Occupations
Exemption
Licenses
Private Postsecondary Education
Private Vocational Program
Professions And Occupations