AZ SB1291 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - House read second time
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - House read second time
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Falls; emergency assistance; liability; training
Title
Falls; emergency assistance; liability; training
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-03-02 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-10-1-0) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-1-1-0) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Assisted Living Facilities
Emergency Aid
Emergency Assistance
Emergency Care
Exceptions
Falls
Health Care Institutions
Liability
Nonliability
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Skilled Nursing Facility
Strike Everything Amendment
Training
Emergency Aid
Emergency Assistance
Emergency Care
Exceptions
Falls
Health Care Institutions
Liability
Nonliability
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Skilled Nursing Facility
Strike Everything Amendment
Training