AZ SB1289 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Chapter 167
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Schools; national motto; state motto

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; national motto; state motto

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10SenateChapter 167
2018-04-10SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-04SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-04SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-04-03HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (33-23-4-0)
2018-04-03HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2018-03-29HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2018-03-13HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-13HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-12HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-03-12HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-2-0-2-0-0)
2018-03-05HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-2-0-0-0-0)
2018-02-27HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2018-02-26HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-21HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-21SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0)
2018-02-21SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2018-02-20SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-20SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-02-19SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-15SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0)
2018-01-24SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-23SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-23SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2018-01-23SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15717Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70404
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1289p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1289s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0167.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70404&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70404&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70404&billStatusActionId=181384&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70404&billStatusActionId=181395&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70404&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70404&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70404&billStatusActionId=182817&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70404&billStatusActionId=182904&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70404&billStatusActionId=182911&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback