AZ SB1289 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-20 - Referred to House GOV Committee
Pending: House Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-20 - Referred to House GOV Committee
Pending: House Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Road improvement and maintenance districts
Title
Road improvement and maintenance districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | House | Referred to House GOV Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | House read second time |
2013-03-19 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |