AZ SB1288 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
High-cost home loans; regulations
Title
High-cost home loans; regulations
Sponsors
Sen. John Nelson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-04-27 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-27 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-22 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) | |
2010-03-15 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-29 | House BI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-16 | Referred to House BI Committee | |
2010-03-16 | House read second time | |
2010-03-15 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-15 | Assigned to House BI Committee | |
2010-03-15 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-03-01 | Transmit to House | |
2010-03-01 | Senate third reading , voting: (22-7-0-0) | |
2010-02-25 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-02-22 | Senate Consent Calendar February 22, 2010 @ 2:39 PM with Objections | |
2010-02-23 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-23 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-22 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-16 | Senate CED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Senate CED Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Senate read second time | |
2010-02-01 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Assigned to Senate CED Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |