AZ SB1287 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Chapter 118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Chapter 118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Securities; registration exemptions
Title
Securities; registration exemptions
Sponsors
Sen. David Farnsworth [R] | Sen. Sylvia Allen [R] | Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Sen. Steve Farley [D] |
Rep. Steve Montenegro [R] | Sen. Steve Smith [R] | Sen. Bob Worsley [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Chapter 118 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-03-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (55-0-5-0) |
2017-03-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-03-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2017-02-27 | House | House BI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-21 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Assigned to House BI Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-16 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |