AZ SB1285 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Chapter 186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Chapter 186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
G&F; in-lieu fee; trust fund
Title
G&F; in-lieu fee; trust fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | Senate | Chapter 186 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-04-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-1-1-0) |
2017-04-05 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-03-28 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-28 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-03-14 | House | House EENR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-07 | House | House read second time |
2017-03-06 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Assigned to House EENR Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-03-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Contractor Retention
Contractors
Facilities
Funds
G&f
Game And Fish
Game And Fish Department, Arizona
Performance Bonds
Professions And Occupations
Technical Correction
Trust Fund
Contractors
Facilities
Funds
G&f
Game And Fish
Game And Fish Department, Arizona
Performance Bonds
Professions And Occupations
Technical Correction
Trust Fund
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 246 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
17 | 265 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 142 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |