AZ SB1279 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-1-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-1-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Students; data; accessibility
Title
Students; data; accessibility
Sponsors
Sen. Tyler Pace [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-1-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-09 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-2-1-0-0) |
2021-03-04 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-24 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Accessibility
Allowable Disclosure
Appropriating Monies
Appropriations
Data
Department Of Education
Education - Title 15
Family Educational Rights And Privacy Act
Joint Legislative Budget Committee
State Board For Charter Schools
State Board Of Education
State General Fund
Student Accountability Information System
Student Level Data
Students
Allowable Disclosure
Appropriating Monies
Appropriations
Data
Department Of Education
Education - Title 15
Family Educational Rights And Privacy Act
Joint Legislative Budget Committee
State Board For Charter Schools
State Board Of Education
State General Fund
Student Accountability Information System
Student Level Data
Students