AZ SB1271 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-31 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Notaries; unlawful practices; immigration

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Notaries; unlawful practices; immigration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-31HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2016-03-29HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-29HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-28HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-0-0-4-0)
2016-03-02HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2016-03-16HouseHouse JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-0-0-0-0)
2016-03-03HouseReferred to House JUD Committee
2016-03-03HouseHouse read second time
2016-03-02HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2016-03-02HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2016-03-02HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2016-03-01SenateTransmit to House
2016-03-01SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (23-6-1-0)
2016-02-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2016-02-23SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2016-01-26SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-17SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0)
2016-01-26SenateReferred to Senate GOV Committee
2016-02-18SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2016-01-27SenateReferred to Senate JUD Committee
2016-01-27SenateSenate read second time
2016-01-26SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2016-01-26SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2016-01-26SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2016-01-26SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=115&Bill_Number=SB1271
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1271p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1271s.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/1271quezada1112.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/h.1271friese.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/h.1271judiciary.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1271.sgov.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1271.sjud.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1271.sthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1271.hjud.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1271.hrules.1.asp

Bill Comments

feedback