AZ SB1254 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chapter 335
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chapter 335
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School district consolidation
Title
School district consolidation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Education Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Education Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | Senate | Chapter 335 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (16-12-2-0) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-25-0-0) |
2018-05-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-04-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-04-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-04-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2018-03-28 | House | House APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-5-0-0-0-0) |
2018-03-26 | House | House ED Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2018-03-05 | House | House read second time |
2018-03-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-03-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-2-0) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Appropriating Monies
Cost Study
Delayed Repeal
Education - Title 15
Special Education
Special Education Programs
Cost Study
Delayed Repeal
Education - Title 15
Special Education
Special Education Programs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 459 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 764 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |