AZ SB1246 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Election; transportation tax; Maricopa County
Title
Election; transportation tax; Maricopa County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | Governor Vetoed | |
2023-06-14 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (16-12-2-0) |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-06-13 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-26-3-0) |
2023-06-13 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-03-28 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-28 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-16 | House | House TI Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-4-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-28 | House | House read second time |
2023-02-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-02-15 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Senate TAT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Applicability
Budget Process (h)
Conditional Enactment (h)
County Transportation Excise Tax (h)
Election (h)
Electronic Certificates Of Title
Energy Source (h)
Maricopa County (h)
Posting (h)
Public Transportation (h)
Repeal (h)
Rules
Special Taxing Districts - Title 48 (h)
System
Taxation - Title 42 (h)
Transportation - Title 28
Transportation Tax (h)
Budget Process (h)
Conditional Enactment (h)
County Transportation Excise Tax (h)
Election (h)
Electronic Certificates Of Title
Energy Source (h)
Maricopa County (h)
Posting (h)
Public Transportation (h)
Repeal (h)
Rules
Special Taxing Districts - Title 48 (h)
System
Taxation - Title 42 (h)
Transportation - Title 28
Transportation Tax (h)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 145 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6307 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6308 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6309 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6310 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6311 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6312 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6352 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6353 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6354 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6355 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6538 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6954 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 702.04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 7671 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 7691 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 7695 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 9204 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 6105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 6105.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 6105.02 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 5102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 5103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 5106 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 5121 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |