AZ SB1246 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - House read second time
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - House read second time
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriation; Tangerine Road; reconstruction
Title
Appropriation; Tangerine Road; reconstruction
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-03-05 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-4-1-0) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-1-1-0) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Adot
Appropriating Monies
Appropriation
Construction
Department Of Transportation
Interstate 10
Minerals, Oil And Gas - Title 27
Open Pit Mining
Operation Of Mines
Roadbeds
Roadways
Strike Everything Amendment
Technical Correction
Tracks
Appropriating Monies
Appropriation
Construction
Department Of Transportation
Interstate 10
Minerals, Oil And Gas - Title 27
Open Pit Mining
Operation Of Mines
Roadbeds
Roadways
Strike Everything Amendment
Technical Correction
Tracks