AZ SB1245 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Vital records; death certificates

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vital records; death certificates

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-03-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-18HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-03-18HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-07HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-27HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2019-02-26HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-02-14HouseTransmit to House
2019-02-14SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2019-02-13SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-12SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-12SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-11SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-06SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0)
2019-01-30SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321322Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36324Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71848
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1245p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1245s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1245h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.12450827.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1245hhs.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71848&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71848&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71848&billStatusActionId=186327&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71848&billStatusActionId=186497&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71848&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71848&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71848&billStatusActionId=188630&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback