AZ SB1245 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-26 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-26 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Security guards; regulations
Title
Security guards; regulations
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Gray [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-15 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-26 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-26 | House ERA Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to House ERA Committee | |
2012-03-15 | House MAPS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) | |
2012-03-06 | Referred to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-03-06 | House read second time | |
2012-03-05 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-05 | Assigned to House ERA Committee | |
2012-03-05 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-03-05 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-03-01 | Transmit to House | |
2012-03-01 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-2-0-0) | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-21 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-21 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-13 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-24 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-08 | Senate PSHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-2-0-0) | |
2012-01-25 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2012-01-25 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-24 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-24 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2012-01-24 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |