AZ SB1244 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Chapter 219 E
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Chapter 219 E
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fire districts; wildland fires; budgets
Title
Fire districts; wildland fires; budgets
Sponsors
Sen. Sylvia Allen [R] | Sen. Carlyle Begay [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Rep. Judy Burges [R] |
Rep. Lupe Contreras [D] | Sen. Adam Driggs [R] | Rep. Robert Meza [D] | Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | Chapter 219 E | |
2016-05-12 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-04 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate final reading , voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-13 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-04-13 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-3-1-0) |
2016-04-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-04-07 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-07 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-07 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-17 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2016-03-03 | House | Referred to House MAPS Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | House read second time |
2016-03-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate NR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate NR Committee |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NR Committee |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |