AZ SB1242 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-19 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-19 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Employer protections; labor relations
Title
Employer protections; labor relations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-19 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-19 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-15 | House RULES Committee action: amended constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-3-0-1-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-04-07 | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-1-0) | |
2010-04-05 | Referred to House COM Committee | |
2010-04-05 | House read second time | |
2010-04-01 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-04-01 | Assigned to House COM Committee | |
2010-04-01 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-03-29 | Transmit to House | |
2010-03-29 | Senate third reading , voting: (16-14-0-0) | |
2010-03-25 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-23 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-23 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-22 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-2-1-0) | |
2010-02-18 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2010-02-18 | Senate CED Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to Senate CED Committee | |
2010-01-28 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-28 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-18 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2010-01-28 | Assigned to Senate CED Committee | |
2010-01-27 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |