AZ SB1241 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Chapter 304
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

State parks board; heritage fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State parks board; heritage fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-07SenateChapter 304
2019-06-07SenateGovernor Signed
2019-05-24SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-05-24SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-05-24HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (54-6-0-0)
2019-05-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-05-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-05-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-05-23HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-3-0-1-0-0)
2019-03-19HouseHouse NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-3-0-0)
2019-03-06HouseHouse read second time
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to House NREW Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-02-28HouseTransmit to House
2019-02-28SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2019-02-26SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-26SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-25SenateSenate consent calendar
2019-02-25SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-19SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-0)
2019-02-06SenateSenate NRE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2019-01-30SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2019-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate NRE Committee
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71844
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1241p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1241s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0304.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71844&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71844&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71844&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71844&billStatusActionId=187428&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71844&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71844&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71844&billStatusActionId=189747&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71844&billStatusActionId=189749&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback