AZ SB1236 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-17 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Statewide petition circulators; registration; committees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Statewide petition circulators; registration; committees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-13 - House - Motion Motion from Representative Espinoza to Recommit to Committee for further study. Motion failed on RCV. (Y: 23 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-13 - House - Motion Subsitute Motion from Representative Espinoza to Retain Bill on the Calendar. Motion failed by RCV. (Y: 23 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House - Motion to Amend (Y: 22 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 23 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-17SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-04-13HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (35-23-2-0)
2017-04-13HouseHouse miscellaneous motion: Motion from Representative Espinoza to Recommit to Committee for further study. Motion failed on RCV., voting: (23-34-3-0)
2017-04-13HouseHouse motion to amend
2017-04-13HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (23-34-3-0)
2017-04-13HouseHouse miscellaneous motion: Subsitute Motion from Representative Espinoza to Retain Bill on the Calendar. Motion failed by RCV., voting: (23-34-3-0)
2017-04-04HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-04-04HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-04-03HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-2-0-2-0-0)
2017-03-29HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-6-0-1-0-0)
2017-03-27HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2017-03-22HouseHouse JPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
2017-03-07HouseHouse read second time
2017-03-06HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-03-06HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2017-03-06HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-02-23HouseTransmit to House
2017-02-22SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (24-6-0-0)
2017-02-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-21SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-21SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-02-15SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-0)
2017-01-25SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-24SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-24SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2017-01-24SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16925Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19118Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19121.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8512.02New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69014
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1236p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1236s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1236h.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.12360156.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.1236hhs.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.1236lesko0434.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.1236farnsworth e.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/h.1236judiciary and public safety.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.1236ugenti-rita.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.1236shooter.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.1236carter2.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/h.1236appropriations.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69014&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69014&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69014&billStatusActionId=175545&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69014&billStatusActionId=175398&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69014&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69014&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69014&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69014&billStatusActionId=176966&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69014&billStatusActionId=176967&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69014&billStatusActionId=176978&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69014&billStatusActionId=176964&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69014&billStatusActionId=176972&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback