AZ SB1234 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibition; photo radar
Title
Prohibition; photo radar
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | Governor Vetoed | |
2023-05-22 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-05-15 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (32-26-1-0) |
2023-04-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2023-03-14 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-14 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-13 | House | House consent calendar |
2023-03-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2023-03-06 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-7-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-28 | House | House read second time |
2023-02-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-02-15 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Definition
Definitions
Legislative Intent
Photo Enforcement
Photo Enforcement System
Photo Radar
Powers Of Local Authorities
Prohibition
Repeal
Transportation - Title 28
Definitions
Legislative Intent
Photo Enforcement
Photo Enforcement System
Photo Radar
Powers Of Local Authorities
Prohibition
Repeal
Transportation - Title 28
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 1201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1202 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1203 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1204 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1205 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1206 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1602 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 627 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |