AZ SB1231 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriation; attorney general; habitat destruction
Title
Appropriation; attorney general; habitat destruction
Sponsors
Sen. Sylvia Allen [R] | Sen. Frank Antenori [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Rep. Gail Griffin [R] |
Rep. Peggy Judd [R] | Sen. Albert Melvin [R] | Rep. Stephen Pierce [R] | Sen. Steve Smith [R] |
Rep. David Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Agriculture and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Agriculture and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-14 | Governor Signed | |
2012-05-03 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-05-03 | Senate final reading , voting: (21-7-2-0) | |
2012-05-03 | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2012-05-01 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-05-01 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-30 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-04-30 | House third reading PASSED voting: (39-20-1-0) | |
2012-04-25 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2012-04-24 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-24 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-23 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2012-02-21 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-21 | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-3-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-21 | Referred to House APPROP Committee | |
2012-03-15 | House AW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0) | |
2012-02-22 | Referred to House AW Committee | |
2012-02-22 | House read second time | |
2012-02-21 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-21 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | |
2012-02-21 | Assigned to House AW Committee | |
2012-02-21 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-02-16 | Transmit to House | |
2012-02-16 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (20-10-0-0) | |
2012-02-13 | Senate Consent Calendar February 13, 2012 @ 1:30 PM | |
2012-02-14 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-14 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-13 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-24 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-3-2-0) | |
2012-01-25 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2012-01-25 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-24 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-24 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2012-01-24 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |