AZ SB1224 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Chapter 12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Empowerment scholarships; qualifications; administration; appropriations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Empowerment scholarships; qualifications; administration; appropriations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Motion Shall the Chair's ruling be overturned that the Friese Amendment is not eligible for debate (Y: 27 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Sen Dalessandro to exclude the Allen flr. amend. (ref bill) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20SenateChapter 12
2020-03-20SenateGovernor Signed
2020-03-16SenateTransmitted to Governor
2020-03-13SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-03-12HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-2-0)
2020-03-12HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2020-03-12HouseHouse miscellaneous motion: Shall the Chair's ruling be overturned that the Friese Amendment is not eligible for debate, voting: (27-31-2-0)
2020-03-12HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-03-12HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-03-12HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-3-0-1-0-0)
2020-03-11HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-4-0-0-0-0)
2020-03-03HouseHouse read second time
2020-03-02HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-03-02HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2020-03-02HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-02-26HouseTransmit to House
2020-02-26SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0)
2020-02-26SenateSenate motion to amend
2020-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2020-02-11SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-11SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-10SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-02-04SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-3-0-0)
2020-01-27SenateSenate read second time
2020-01-23SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-01-23SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2020-01-23SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152401Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/73452
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1224p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1224s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/laws/0012.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/s.12240342.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1224ed.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1224floorallen s.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1224floorbrophy mcgee.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.1224friese.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.1224fernandez.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73452&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73452&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73452&billStatusActionId=194122&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73452&billStatusActionId=194287&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73452&billStatusActionId=194304&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73452&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73452&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73452&billStatusActionId=195803&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73452&billStatusActionId=195805&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73452&billStatusActionId=195806&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73452&billStatusActionId=195867&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback