AZ SB1219 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real estate licensees
Title
Real estate licensees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-20 | Senate final reading , voting: (28-0-2-0) | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-20 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-20 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-13 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-04-13 | House third reading , voting: (45-11-4-0) | |
2010-04-12 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-04-12 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-12 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-08 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) | |
2010-03-15 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-24 | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-1-0-2-0) | |
2010-03-16 | Referred to House COM Committee | |
2010-03-16 | House read second time | |
2010-03-15 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-15 | Assigned to House COM Committee | |
2010-03-15 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-03-01 | Transmit to House | |
2010-03-01 | Senate third reading , voting: (29-0-0-0) | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-02-16 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-16 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-15 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Senate CED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-2-0) | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to Senate CED Committee | |
2010-01-28 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-28 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-28 | Assigned to Senate CED Committee | |
2010-01-27 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |