AZ SB1211 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Transmitted to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Intermediate care facilities; licensure

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Intermediate care facilities; licensure

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18 Transmitted to Governor
2019-04-17SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-04-17HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2019-04-09HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-09HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-08HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-04-08HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-1-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-14HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-12HouseHouse read second time
2019-03-11HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-03-11HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2019-03-11HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-02-27HouseTransmit to House
2019-02-27SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2019-02-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-19SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-19SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-18SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-13SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2019-01-29SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-28SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2019-01-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
36401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36424Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36425.05New CodeSee Bill Text
36551Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36591Amended CodeSee Bill Text
41619.57Amended CodeSee Bill Text
46459Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8804Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71789
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1211p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1211s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.1211carter.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1211hhs.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71789&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71789&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71789&billStatusActionId=186791&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71789&billStatusActionId=187212&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71789&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71789&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71789&billStatusActionId=189011&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback