AZ SB1205 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Sentencing; dangerous drugs; methamphetamine
Title
Sentencing; dangerous drugs; methamphetamine
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-25 | House third reading , voting: (28-0-2-0) | |
2010-03-01 | House Consent Calendar March 01, 2010 @ 2:33 PM | |
2010-03-02 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-02 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-01-26 | Referred to House Committee | |
2010-01-27 | Referred to House Committee | |
2010-01-27 | House read second time | |
2010-03-25 | Transmit to House | |
2010-03-25 | Senate third reading , voting: (28-0-2-0) | |
2010-03-01 | Senate Consent Calendar March 01, 2010 @ 2:33 PM | |
2010-03-02 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-02 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-01 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-01-26 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-22 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) | |
2010-01-27 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2010-01-27 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-26 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-26 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2010-01-26 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |