AZ SB1201 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Chapter 270
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Chapter 270
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Medical examiner; communicable diseases; disclosure
Title
Medical examiner; communicable diseases; disclosure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House Health Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House Health Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | Chapter 270 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (54-0-6-0) |
2017-04-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-04-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-04-03 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-04-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2017-03-23 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2017-03-16 | House | House read second time |
2017-03-15 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-03-09 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Communicable Disease
Counties
County Medical Examiner
Disclosure
Medical Examiners
Public Health And Safety
Counties
County Medical Examiner
Disclosure
Medical Examiners
Public Health And Safety