AZ SB1199 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Divorce; waiting period; educational programs
Title
Divorce; waiting period; educational programs
Sponsors
Rep. Ray Barnes [R] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Rep. Sam Crump [R] |
Rep. Doris Goodale [R] | Sen. Linda Gray [R] | Rep. Jack Harper [R] | Sen. Debbie Lesko [R] |
Rep. Steve Montenegro [R] | Rep. Carl Seel [R] | Sen. Thayer Verschoor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-25 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-25 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-25 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-01-26 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-17 | Senate PSHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-0) | |
2010-01-27 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2010-01-27 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-26 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-26 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2010-01-26 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |