AZ SB1196 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-16 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-16 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Political "do not call" list
Title
Political "do not call" list
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (01/26/15) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (01/26/15) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-16 | House | House ELECT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-0-0-0) |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to House ELECT Committee |
2015-03-16 | House | House read second time |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to House ELECT Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-1-2-0) |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate GOV Committee |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |